VA HB990 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorization of nonlethal control measures against elk. Grants the Director of the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries the option to authorize nonlethal control measures against elk found to be responsible for damage. The current statute grants such an option with respect to bear only.
Title
Elk; authorization of nonlethal control measures against.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB990ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-30 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 12101053D-E | |
2012-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB990E | |
2012-01-27 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101053D |