VA HB99 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful dissemination or publication of tax information. Changes the unlawful dissemination or publication of tax information from a Class 2 to a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Tax information; changes unlawful dissemination or publication to Class 1 misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194) | |
2014-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB99ER) |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-27 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100124D |