VA HB98 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public secondary schools; satisfaction of physical education requirements; participation in Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps. Permits each local school board to accept participation in the Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps as fulfillment of any physical education requirements applicable to students in grades nine through 12.
Title
Public secondary schools; satisfaction in physical education requirement, participation in Jr. ROTC.
Sponsors
Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Del. AC Cordoza [R] | Del. Chris Obenshain [R] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB98ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senators: VanValkenburg, Pekarsky, Suetterlein |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Delegates: Convirs-Fowler, Reaser, Green |
2024-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 99-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2023-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101212D |