VA HB978 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; proton radiation therapy coverage decisions. Prohibits health insurance policies and plans from holding proton radiation therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for benefit coverage decisions than is applied for other types of radiation therapy treatment. The measure applies to policies and plans that provide coverage for cancer therapy.
Title
Health insurance; proton radiation therapy coverage decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102932D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3419.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB978 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB978+hil |