VA HB977 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
County food and beverage tax; allowable tax rate; removal of referendum requirement. Removes the four percent limit on the tax rate that counties may impose on food and beverages. The bill also removes the requirement that a county hold a referendum before imposing such a tax.
Title
County food and beverage tax; allowable tax rate, removal of referendum requirement.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporated by Finance |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105088D |
Same As/Similar To
HB729 (Similar To) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3842 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB977 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB977+hil |