VA HB965 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia taxable income; deductions; Energy Star certified water heater. Provides a deduction for the purchase of any water heater for residential use that is Energy Star certified equal to the lesser of 20 percent of the actual price paid or $500, beginning in taxable year 2022. The bill limits to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2022, the current provisions allowing individuals to deduct from their taxable personal income an amount equal to 20 percent of the sales taxes paid, up to $500, for an electric heat pump hot water heater that yields an energy factor of at least 1.7 and an advanced gas or oil water heater that has an energy factor of at least 0.65.
Title
Income tax, state; deductions for Energy Star certified water heater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 6-N) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104041D |