VA HB965 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; Department of Agriculture and Consumer Affairs; powers and duties relating to consumer protection laws. Transfers investigative and consumer complaint and dispute resolution functions for certain consumer protection laws from the Office of Consumer Affairs within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Affairs to the Division of Consumer Counsel within the Office of the Attorney General.
Title
Consumer protection laws; transfers investigative and consumer complaint to OAG.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Left in General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB965H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104904D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104904D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103547D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 517.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 517.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |