VA HB964 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; methods of procurement; submitting bids electronically. Provides that all state public bodies accepting bids or proposals for contracts pursuant to the Virginia Public Procurement Act shall provide an option to submit bids or proposals through the Commonwealth's electronic procurement system, known as eVA. The Director of the Department of General Services, or his designee, is authorized under the bill to grant an exemption from such requirement at the request of a state public body and upon a showing of good cause. In the bill, local public bodies are encouraged to use eVA to offer an electronic submission option. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023. Virginia Public Procurement Act; methods of procurement; submitting bids electronically. Provides that all state public bodies accepting bids or proposals for contracts pursuant to the Virginia Public Procurement Act shall provide an option to submit bids or proposals through the Commonwealth's electronic procurement system, known as eVA. The Director of the Department of General Services, or his designee, is authorized under the bill to grant an exemption from such requirement at the request of a state public body and upon a showing of good cause. In the bill, local public bodies are encouraged to use eVA to offer an electronic submission option. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; methods of procurement, submitting bids electronically.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB964ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from General Laws (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104263D |