VA HB964 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Contractors; exemptions from licensure. Exempts from licensure any person who performs the construction, removal, repair, or improvement of real property retained by a licensed contractor, provided that (i) such person (a) is authorized to transact business in the Commonwealth pursuant to one of the business entity statutes administered by the State Corporation Commission, (b) possesses a valid business license in accordance with Chapter 37 (§58.1-3700 et seq.) of Title 58.1, and (c) carries workers' compensation insurance and other required insurance coverage and (ii) the work performed by such person is under the direct supervision and control of the retaining licensed contractor.
Title
Contractors, Board for; exemptions from licensure.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103922D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB964 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB964+hil |