VA HB962 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Daniel and Brenda Brewer. Provides relief in the amount of $214,967.22 to Daniel and Brenda Brewer to correct structural problems with their home. The home contains several structural problems that were not noted by the local building official during any of the inspections conducted by the Uniform Statewide Building Code. In addition, the building official issued a certificate of occupancy despite the existence of the structural problems
Title
Claims; Daniel and Brenda Brewer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102489D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB962 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB962+hil |