VA HB96 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Driving recklessly on a suspended or revoked license and causing the death of another person; penalty. Provides that any person convicted of reckless driving who, when he committed the offense, (i) was driving on a suspended or revoked operator's license and (ii) as the proximate result of his reckless driving, caused the death of another person is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Currently, a person is only guilty of such felony if his operator's license was suspended or revoked due to a moving violation and his reckless driving was the sole and proximate cause of the other person's death.
Title
Reckless driving; causing death while driving with suspended license, guilty of Class 6 felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 90 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 90 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB96H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104737D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104737D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100796D |