VA HB953 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; mandatory employment of special counsel for the State Board of Elections under certain circumstances. Provides that whenever the Attorney General is entitled to have his name printed on the ballot in a general or special election, he shall recuse himself from providing legal services to the State Board of Elections and employ special counsel to provide such services. The bill requires the compensation for the special counsel to be paid out of the appropriation for the Attorney General's office.
Title
Elections, State Board of; Attorney General to recuse himself, special counsel mandatory employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101474D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Attorney General
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Elections
Attorney General
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Elections