VA HB949 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of local special events licensees. Changes the provision limiting local special events licenses from 12 to 16 special events per year, and provides that the duration of any special event shall not exceed three consecutive days.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of local special events licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 24, 2020 | |
2020-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 17, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB949ER) |
2020-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB949H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106228D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106228D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103444D |
Same As/Similar To
SB689 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)