VA HB929 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of certain firearms; criminal history record information check; exemption. Provides that persons who hold a federal firearms license Type 03 - Collector of Curios and Relics are exempt from the criminal history record information check requirements to purchase certain firearms.
Title
Firearms, certain; transfer, criminal history record information check exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102470D |