VA HB929 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Promotion of cybersecurity in the Commonwealth. Initiates several efforts to promote economic development, research and development, and workforce development of the cybersecurity industry in the Commonwealth. The bill creates two new matching grant funds: one administered by the Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority for private entities that collaborate with one or more public institutions of higher education on research and development related to cybersecurity and one administered by the Department of Education for public elementary and secondary schools for STEM-related programs. The bill directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority (VEDP), in consultation with the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, to develop an online cybersecurity network. VEDP will be aided by an advisory committee consisting of representatives from higher education, the community college system, the Joint Commission on Technology and Science, and the Secretaries of Commerce and Trade, Education, and Technology. Finally, the bill directs the Secretary of Technology to organize and convene a Virginia Cybersecurity Conference to showcase Virginia's leadership in the field of cybersecurity. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Technology and Science.
Title
Cybersecurity; promotion of industry in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105026D-H1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101501D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2233.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2240.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 362 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 363 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 364 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |