VA HB922 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric vehicle charging stations; local and public operation. Authorizes any locality or public institution of higher education, or the Department of Conservation and Recreation, to locate and operate a retail fee-based electric vehicle charging station on property such entity owns or leases. The bill allows a locality to limit the use of a retail fee-based electric vehicle charging station on its property to employees of the locality and authorized visitors and to install signage that provides notice of such restriction. The bill exempts such a locality, public institution of higher education, or the Department of Conservation and Recreation from being considered a public utility solely because of the sale of electric vehicle charging service or the ownership or operation of an electric vehicle charging station and further exempts such service from constituting the retail sale of electricity. This bill is identical to SB 908.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric vehicle charging stations; local and public operation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
2018-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB922ER)
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2018-02-21SenateRereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HousePrinted as engrossed 18104708D-E
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB922E
2018-02-09HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-09HouseRead second time
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104708D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101104.01(n/a)See Bill Text
152967.2(n/a)See Bill Text
2311301.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2312908.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB922
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB922+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB922E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB922ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0446+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1101V0059+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0091+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0535+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0109+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0162+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB0922+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0804HB0922+HB0922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1285+HB0922

Bill Comments

feedback