VA HB917 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; recount; programming of optical scan tabulators. Provides that if an optical scan tabulator cannot be programmed to count only the ballots for an office or issue in question in a recount, the tabulator shall be programmed to set aside all ballots that contain write-in votes, overvotes, and undervotes for any office or issue to be hand counted using State Board of Elections standards.
Title
Elections; programming optical scan tabulators for recount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102388D |