VA HB916 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Substantial Risk Order Reporting System established. Requires the Department of State Police to establish a Substantial Risk Order Reporting System for the purpose of tracking and reporting substantial risk orders by locality and to publish such reports on a monthly basis and distribute them in an electronic format to the General Assembly and the Office of the Governor. The bill provides that the Department shall remove the names and other personal identifying information from the data before the reports are published. Substantial Risk Order Reporting System established. Requires the Department of State Police to establish a Substantial Risk Order Reporting System for the purpose of tracking and reporting substantial risk orders by locality and to publish such reports on a monthly basis and distribute them in an electronic format to the General Assembly and the Office of the Governor. The bill provides that the Department shall remove the names and other personal identifying information from the data before the reports are published.
Title
Substantial Risk Order Reporting System; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB916ER) |
2024-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24103521D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB916E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103521D |