VA HB913 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Parole Board; voting requirements. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law or regulation, if the Parole Board adopts a rule or regulation requiring the concurrence of four or more members of the Board to grant discretionary parole or conditional release, in the event that there are less than four members but at least three members on the Parole Board, then such requirement shall be satisfied upon a unanimous vote of the members on the Board. Parole Board; voting requirements. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law or regulation, if the Parole Board adopts a rule or regulation requiring the concurrence of four or more members of the Board to grant discretionary parole or conditional release, in the event that there are less than four members but at least three members on the Parole Board, then such requirement shall be satisfied upon a unanimous vote of the members on the Board.
Title
Parole Board; voting requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB913ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (83-Y 16-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (83-Y 16-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100146D |