VA HB912 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stores and telephone systems in local correctional facilities; fees. Provides that the net profits from the operation of stores and telephonic communication systems in local correctional facilities shall be used within each facility respectively for educational, recreational, or medical purposes for the benefit of the inmates to include behavioral health, substance abuse, reentry, and rehabilitative services and may be expended to pay for the training, salaries, and benefits of employees or contractors whose primary job is to provide such programs and services to the inmates. Stores and telephone systems in local correctional facilities; fees. Provides that the net profits from the operation of stores and telephonic communication systems in local correctional facilities shall be used within each facility respectively for educational, recreational, or medical purposes for the benefit of the inmates to include behavioral health, substance abuse, reentry, and rehabilitative services and may be expended to pay for the training, salaries, and benefits of employees or contractors whose primary job is to provide such programs and services to the inmates.
Title
Correctional facilities, local; stores and telephone systems, fees.
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 402 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB912ER) |
2024-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-29 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB912H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106920D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106920D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101439D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 115.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 131.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 131.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |