VA HB910 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of pharmacy; compounding; regulation by Board of Practice of pharmacy; compounding; regulation by Board of Pharmacy. Provides that the compounding of drugs provided to the Department of Corrections for the purpose of carrying out an execution by lethal injection constitutes the practice of pharmacy and is subject to the requirements of the Drug Control Act and the jurisdiction of the Board of Pharmacy. The bill provides that only outsourcing facilities may compound such drugs; currently, both pharmacies and outsourcing facilities may compound such drugs. The bill also clarifies that the Board of Pharmacy may inspect any pharmacy or other place where drugs, cosmetics, or devices are manufactured, stored, or dispensed in response to complaints received by the Board, in any case in which the Board has reason to believe that the pharmacy or such other place has violated any state or federal law, or as otherwise deemed necessary by the Board to protect the health and safety of the public. The bill replaces one of the two consumer positions on the Board of Health with a pharmacist with experience in compounding, requires the Board of Health to educate the public about safe use of compounded drugs, and requires the Board of Health and the Board of Pharmacy to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly on actions taken (i) to ensure the safety and quality of compounded drugs produced by compounding pharmacies and outsourcing facilities located in the Commonwealth, as well as those outside the Commonwealth that provide compounded drugs to patients in the Commonwealth; (ii) to reduce illegal use of opioids and opioid abuse in the Commonwealth; and (iii) to implement provisions of and ensure compliance with the requirements of federal law related to prescription drug
Title
Pharmacy; compounding of drugs, regulation by Board of Pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101294D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 11.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |