VA HB905 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Photo speed monitoring devices; location. Authorizes the governing body of any county, city, or town to provide by ordinance for the placement and operation of photo speed monitoring devices in any location deemed necessary by the locality for the purposes of recording violations resulting from the operation of a vehicle in excess of the speed limit. The bill provides the same requirements for such devices, information collected from such devices, and any enforcement actions resulting from information collected from such devices as current law applies to the use of such devices in school crossing zones and highway work zones. The bill requires that two signs, rather than one, be placed warning of such device if the device is placed somewhere other than a school crossing zone or highway work zone.
Title
Photo speed monitoring devices; location.
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Incorporated by Transportation |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB20-Jones) by voice vote |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Innovations (Ad Hoc) |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102336D |
Same As/Similar To
HB20 (Similar To) 2024-02-06 - Continued to 2025 in Transportation by voice vote
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Local Government and Officials
Motor Vehicles
Ordinances
Photo-Monitoring
Speed Limits
Local Government and Officials
Motor Vehicles
Ordinances
Photo-Monitoring
Speed Limits
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB905 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB905+hil |