VA HB902 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Creation of the Commonwealth Genomics and Personalized Medicine Authority. Creates the Commonwealth Genomics and Personalized Medicine Authority (the Authority) as a political subdivision of the Commonwealth. The Authority's purpose is to encourage coordination and collaboration between public and private entities in the Commonwealth in translational research and commercialization related to genomics and personalized medicine.
Title
Commonwealth Genomics and Personalized Medicine Authority; created, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102757D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2259 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2351 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2359 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB902 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB902+hil |