VA HB899 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Military surplus off-road motor vehicles; antique vehicles. Clarifies that military surplus off-road motor vehicles can qualify as antique vehicles. The bill defines military surplus off-road motor vehicles as those that were manufactured by or under the direction of the United States Armed Forces and subsequently authorized for sale to civilians.
Title
Military surplus off-road motor vehicles; qualified as an antique vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101676D |