VA HB896 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Background checks; certain private school employees. Requires the governing board or administrator of a private elementary or secondary school that is accredited pursuant to § 22.1-19 of the Code of Virginia that operates a child welfare agency regulated by the Department of Social Services to accept evidence of a background check conducted by the Department of Social Services in lieu of a background check in accordance with the requirements governing private schools, beginning on July 1, 2016. The bill also requires governing boards or administrators of private schools accredited pursuant to § 22.1-19 to require, as a condition of employment, that any applicant who is offered or who accepts employment requiring direct contact with students provide written consent and personal information necessary to obtain a search of the central registry of founded complaints of child abuse and neglect maintained by the Department of Social Services beginning on July 1, 2016.
Title
Private school employees, certain; requirement of background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0454) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective - see bill) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB896ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB896H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105002D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105002D-H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103837D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1720.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1724 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |