VA HB896 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores. Removes the current limitations on the operation of government stores on Sunday and authorizes the ABC Board to determine which such stores shall be open on Sunday after 1 p.m.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday operation of government stores after 1:00 p.m.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger rejected 12105547D-S1 (13-Y 27-N) (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger reconsidered 12105547D-S1 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 12105547D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger rejected 12105547D-S1 (13-Y 27-N) (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger reconsidered 12105547D-S1 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 12105547D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 245 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB896ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger rejected 12105547D-S1 (13-Y 27-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger reconsidered 12105547D-S1 (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 12105547D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105547D-S1 (Hanger) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-27 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103584D-E | |
2012-01-26 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB896E | |
2012-01-26 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-24 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103584D |