VA HB889 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tolls on Midtown or Downtown Tunnels. Requires that, if tolls are collected for use of the Midtown or Downtown Tunnels between Norfolk and Portsmouth, users will be able to pay tolls without use of automated or electronic devices.
Title
Tolls; collected for use of Midtown or Downtown Tunnels between Norfolk and Portsmouth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102920D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB889 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB889+hil |