VA HB885 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Onsite sewage systems; authority of the Board of Health. Clarifies that the Board of Health shall have supervision and control over the maintenance, inspection, and reuse of conventional onsite sewage systems as well as alternative onsite sewage systems.
Title
Conventional or alternative onsite sewage systems; authority of the Board of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 20g |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommitted to Education and Health |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Floor substitute printed to LIS only 18107849D-S1 (Barker) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101589D-E |
2018-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB885E |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101589D |