VA HB876 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives. Establishes an interstate compact among the Commonwealth of Virginia, the State of Maryland, and the District of Columbia (the party states) that prohibits the party states from providing incentives for a Washington area professional football team franchise facility, including tax incentives, state or local appropriations, and loans. The bill provides that the compact will not become effective unless the party states enact concurring legislation prior to January 1, 2019.
Title
Washington Area Prof. Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives, Interstate Compact on; establish.
Sponsors
Del. Michael Webert [R] | Del. Christopher Collins [R] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101017D |