VA HB876 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - House: Continued to 2011 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - House: Continued to 2011 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fences along Interstate highways. Requires VDOT to adhere to local policies in installing and maintaining fences along Interstate Highway System components.
Title
Fences along Interstate highways; VDOT to adhere to local policies in installing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | House: Continued to 2011 in Transportation by voice vote | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102762D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB876 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB876+hil |