VA HB875 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosure of real-time location data in emergencies. Provides that an investigative or law-enforcement officer may obtain real-time location data from an electronic communication service or remote computing service provider when the officer believes that an emergency involving immediate danger to a person requires such disclosure and a warrant for such disclosure cannot be obtained in time to prevent the identified danger, regardless of whether the service provider believes that such disclosure is required by the emergency.
Title
Real-time location data; disclosure in emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 576 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB875ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101883D-E |
2016-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB875E |
2016-02-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101883D |