VA HB873 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; closed meeting exemption; home instruction of children. Creates an exemption from the open meeting requirements of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act for discussion, consideration, or decisions relating to home instruction of children, unless objected to by a parent or guardian in an open meeting, that are exempt from disclosure pursuant to relevant law.
Title
Virginia FOIA; creates closed meeting exemption where related to home instruction of children.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Earley [R] | Del. Chad Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101877D |