VA HB870 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officers; conduct of investigation. Requires that a law-enforcement officer who is under investigation for an officer-involved shooting or an instance of alleged use of excessive force be questioned not more than 24 hours after the incident is reported.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; conduct of investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103120D |