VA HB866 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mutual aid agreements. Includes private police forces of institutions of higher learning in existing provisions that allow for mutual aid agreements for the joint use of police forces.
Title
Mutual aid agreements; includes private police forces of higher educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB866ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102772D |