VA HB855 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Number of judges; general district court; 25th Judicial District. Adds a fourth judge to the maximum number allowed in the 25th Judicial District, general district court (Alleghany, Augusta, Bath, Botetourt, Buena Vista, Covington, Craig, Highland, Lexington, Rockbridge, Staunton, and Waynesboro). This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Judges; adding maximum number in 25th Judicial District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102761D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB855 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB855+hil |