VA HB853 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration and enforcement of cigarette laws. Modifies several provisions relating to the administration and enforcement of Virginia's cigarette laws by providing that (i) violations of cigarette tax laws may be investigated by a multijurisdiction grand jury; (ii) counterfeit or unstamped cigarettes or cigarettes in the possession of an unauthorized holder may be assigned by court order for use by a law-enforcement undercover operation; (iii) a person convicted of possessing unstamped cigarettes would be ineligible to be an authorized holder of cigarettes; (iv) members of federal, state, and local law enforcement would be exempt from cigarette taxes when the cigarettes are used in the performance of investigatory duties; (v) manufacturers and distributors of cigarettes would be allowed to ship or deliver unstamped cigarettes to a law-enforcement agency for use in the performance of its duties; and (vi) where a sealed pack is labeled as containing cigarettes, such labeling would constitute prima facie evidence that the pack is a pack of cigarettes. The bill also substantially increases the civil penalties for possession with intent to distribute tax-paid contraband cigarettes by a person other than an authorized holder. Penalties are graduated based on the number of offenses and the amount that is currently the maximum fine is the minimum fine under the bill.
Title
Cigarette laws; administration and enforcement, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 422 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB853ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 16-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (83-Y 16-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102662D-E |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB853E |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102662D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1017.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1017.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |