VA HB846 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Stormwater Management Program; exemptions for certain localities. Exempts the Towns of Chincoteague, Saxis, and Tangier from compliance with the Virginia Stormwater Management Program. The bill exempts Chincoteague and Tangier Islands from any VSMP for land-disturbing activities adopted by Accomack County.
Title
Virginia Stormwater Management Program; exemptions for certain localities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | House | Continued to 2015 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102760D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB846 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB846+hil |