VA HB833 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Asbestos, Lead, Mold, and Home Inspectors; regulation of home energy auditors. Provides for the licensure of home energy auditors by the Board for Asbestos, Lead, Mold, and Home Inspectors. The bill defines home energy audits and includes one licensed home energy auditor to be appointed to the Board for Asbestos, Lead, Mold, and Home Inspectors, and changes the name of the Board to Board for Asbestos, Lead, Mold, Home Inspectors, and Home Energy Auditors.
Title
Asbestos, Lead, Mold, and Home Inspectors, Board for; regulation of home energy auditors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103779D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 517.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 517.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |