VA HB829 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Group homes; license application; notice. Requires persons applying for licensure as a group home with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to provide notice to the local governing body, the general public, and residential occupants within one-half mile of the proposed location of the group home. The bill requires that such notices include a statement of intent to operate a group home and the address of the proposed location of the group home. The bill also requires (i) the Department to establish and maintain a process for receiving comments regarding such notices and (ii) the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to consider all comments received within 30 days of the notice when deciding whether to grant the license application.
Title
Group homes; license application, notice to locality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101150D |