VA HB829 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescribers of covered substances; continuing education. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Health Professions to disclose information to the Board of Medicine about prescribers who meet a certain threshold for prescribing covered substances for the purpose of requiring relevant continuing education. The threshold shall be determined by the Board of Medicine in consultation with the Prescription Monitoring Program. The bill also directs the Board of Medicine to require prescribers identified by the Director of the Department of Health Professions to complete two hours of continuing education in each biennium on topics related to pain management, the responsible prescribing of covered substances, and the diagnosis and management of addiction. Prescribers required to complete continuing education shall be notified of such requirement no later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year. The provisions of the bill will expire on July 1, 2022.
Title
Prescribers of covered substances; continuing education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0447) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB829ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101455D-E |
2016-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB829E |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101455D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2912.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |