VA HB825 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Center for Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention; Virginia Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund; creation. Establishes the Virginia Center for Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention (the Center) within the Department of Criminal Justice Services and transfers to the Center the administration of the existing Virginia Gun Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund.
Title
Firearm Violence Intervention and Prevention, Virginia Center for; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103604D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 1 | 116.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 194 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |