VA HB822 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Cable television operators; billing; explanation of tax charges. Requires that bills to subscribers from a cable operator include a concise explanation of any itemized charge that the cable operator attributes to taxes, educational fees, or other governmental obligations. The bill provides that in lieu of printing the explanatory text on the bill, the cable operator may include the address of a website that displays the explanation.
Title
Cable television operators; billing, explanation of tax charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103682D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB822 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB822+hil |