VA HB822 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-22 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-22 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Petitions for child support, custody, or visitation. Clarifies that issues of support, custody, and visitation for a child may be included in a single petition in juvenile and domestic relations district court, and that such issues may be included in a single petition involving two or more children if such children have the same parents or legal guardians.
Title
Child support, etc.; single petition may be filed in juvenile & domestic relations district court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103302D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB822 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB822+hil |