VA HB816 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public Guardian and Conservator Advisory Board. Removes from the membership of the Public Guardian and Conservator Advisory Board (the Advisory Board) one representative of the Virginia Guardianship Association. The bill also moves existing provisions relating to the Advisory Board from Title 2.2 (Administration of Government) to Title 51.5 (Persons with Disabilities) for administrative purposes.
Title
Public Guardian and Conservator Advisory Board; established, membership, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040) | |
2016-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 40 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2016 | |
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/19/16 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB816ER) |
2016-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101383D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 149.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 149.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |