VA HB798 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Employment; prohibited retaliatory action. Prohibits an employer from discharging, disciplining, threatening, discriminating against, penalizing, or taking other retaliatory action against an employee regarding the employee's compensation, terms, conditions, location, or privileges of employment because the employee (i) reports a violation of any federal or state law or regulation to a supervisor or to any governmental body or law-enforcement official; (ii) is requested by a governmental body or law-enforcement official to participate in an investigation, hearing, or inquiry; (iii) refuses to engage in a criminal act that would subject the employee to criminal liability; (iv) refuses an employer's order to perform an action that violates any federal or state law or regulation and the employee informs the employer that the order is being refused for that reason; or (v) provides information to or testifies before any governmental body or law-enforcement official conducting an investigation, hearing, or inquiry into any alleged violation by the employer of federal or state law or regulation. A person who alleges a violation of this chapter may bring a civil action seeking injunctive relief, reinstatement, and compensation for lost wages, benefits, and other remuneration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment; prohibited retaliatory action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N 1-A) (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (20-Y 16-N) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1136)
2020-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1136 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB798ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N 1-A)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (65-Y 28-N 1-A)
2020-03-07HouseSecond Conference substitute printed 20109977D-H2
2020-03-07HouseDelegates: Delaney, Heretick, Miyares
2020-03-07HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2020-03-07SenateSenators: Surovell, Deeds, Obenshain
2020-03-07SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-07SenateSenate acceded to request for second conference committee (20-Y 16-N)
2020-03-07HouseHouse requested second conference committee
2020-03-07HouseConference report ruled not germane
2020-03-07HouseFirst Conference substitute printed 20109692D-H1
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Surovell, Deeds, Obenshain
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Delaney, Heretick, Miyares
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-05SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate insisted on substitute (23-Y 16-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
2020-03-05HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109417D-S1 (1-Y 98-N)
2020-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB798S1
2020-03-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109417D-S1
2020-03-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-04SenateRead third time
2020-03-03SenatePassed by for the day
2020-03-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109417D-S1
2020-03-02SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2020-02-28SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2020-02-28SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2020-02-27SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N)
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (76-Y 22-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-01-30HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (15-Y 4-N)
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103743D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40127.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB798&201+sum+HB798
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB798+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB798S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB798H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB798H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB798ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1136+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1401V0024+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0132+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0425+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0215+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0798+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0448+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1518HB0798+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1993+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1627HB0798+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1809HB0798+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2123+HB0798
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1857HB0798+HB0798

Bill Comments

feedback