VA HB798 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB173-Pogge) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB173-Pogge) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administration and dispensing of necessary drugs by emergency medical services personnel. Provides that certified emergency medical services personnel who are employed by or affiliated with a licensed emergency medical services agency and who have received the training necessary to safely administer or dispense necessary drugs may administer skin tests for influenza or tuberculosis in nonemergency settings to public safety personnel and, upon the request of the local health director, the general public.
Title
Drugs; certified emergency medical services personnel may administer and dispense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB173-Pogge) by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB173-Pogge) by voice vote | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103798D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 42.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 48.016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB798 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB798+hil |