VA HB795 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conveyance of easement. Authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to grant and convey a temporary construction and ingress and egress easement over Neabsco Road at Leesylvania State Park to the Newport Estates Homeowners Association, Inc. The easement will allow ingress and egress for the repairs and restoration to a slope failure due to poor soils on the neighborhood open space property by the Newport Estates Homeowners Association.
Title
DCR; conveying certain property to Newport Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102612D |