VA HB795 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; association health plans. Provides that for policies of group accident and sickness insurance issued to an association, members of such an association may include (i) a self-employed individual and (ii) an employer member with at least one employee that is domiciled in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that for such policies issued to an association that covers at least 51 members and employees of employer members of such association on the first day of the plan year the policies shall be considered a large group market plan and are required to meet various provisions in the bill. The bill provides that to determine the size of an association all of the members and employees of employer members are aggregated and treated as employed by a single employer.
Title
Health insurance; association health plans.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Don Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: Agree to (50-Y 43-N) (Y: 50 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (26-Y 68-N) (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (26-Y 68-N) (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2020-04-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 22, 2020 | |
2020-04-29 | House | Communicated to Governor on April 29, 2020 |
2020-04-22 | House | (Requires affirmative vote of 2/3 of members present) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: Agree to (50-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Motion by Delegate Gilbert to pass in erolled form rejected (50-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (26-Y 68-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (26-Y 68-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB795ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 3-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 3-N) |
2020-03-03 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Marsden, Newman |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: Hurst, Guzman, Kilgore |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108498D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB795S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108498D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108498D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB795H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106947D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106947D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102732D |
Same As/Similar To
SB235 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3437 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3521.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |