VA SB235 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; association health plans. Provides that for policies of group accident and sickness insurance issued to an association, members of such an association may include (i) a self-employed individual and (ii) an employer member with at least one employee that is domiciled in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that for such policies issued to an association that covers at least 51 members and employees of employer members of such association on the first day of the plan year the policies shall be considered a large group market plan and are required to meet various provisions in the bill. The bill provides that to determine the size of an association all of the members and employees of employer members are aggregated and treated as employed by a single employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; association health plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 45-N) (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 3-N) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 22, 2020
2020-04-22SenateCommunicated to Governor
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 45-N)
2020-04-22HousePassed by for the day (48-Y 45-N)
2020-04-22SenatePassed in enrolled form (35-Y 5-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (4-Y 36-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB235ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-03-04SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03HouseVOTE: Agree To (93-Y 3-N)
2020-03-03HouseConference report agreed to by House (93-Y 3-N)
2020-03-03 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-02HouseDelegates: Hurst, Guzman, Kilgore
2020-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-28SenateSenators: Barker, Marsden, Newman
2020-02-28SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-28SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-25SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 3-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with substitute (91-Y 3-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB235H1
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108591D-H1
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108591D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106105D-ES1
2020-01-28SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB235ES1
2020-01-28SenateAmendments by Senator Barker agreed to
2020-01-28SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-28SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB235S1
2020-01-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106105D-S1
2020-01-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-23SenateRead second time
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106105D-S1
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateAssigned C&L sub: Health Insurance
2020-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101513D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823431(n/a)See Bill Text
3823437(n/a)See Bill Text
3823521.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB235&201+sum+SB235
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB235+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB235S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB235ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB235H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB235ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0025+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0119SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0196SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0197SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0198SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0268+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1153+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0942SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1251SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1726+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1490SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1967SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1968SB0235+SB0235
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2293+SB0235

Bill Comments

feedback