VA HB793 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Nurse practitioners; practice agreements. Eliminates the requirement for a practice agreement with a patient care team physician for a licensed nurse practitioner who has completed the equivalent of at least five years of full-time clinical experience and submitted an attestation from his patient care team physician stating (i) that the patient care team physician has served as a patient care team physician on a patient care team with the nurse practitioner pursuant to a practice agreement; (ii) that while a party to such practice agreement, the patient care team physician routinely practiced with a patient population and in a practice area included within the category for which the nurse practitioner was certified and licensed; and (iii) the period of time for which the patient care team physician practiced with the nurse practitioner under such a practice agreement. The bill requires that a nurse practitioner authorized to practice without a practice agreement (a) only practice within the scope of his clinical and professional training and limits of his knowledge and experience and consistent with the applicable standards of care, (b) consult and collaborate with other health care providers based on the clinical conditions of the patient to whom health care is provided, and (c) establish a plan for referral of complex medical cases and emergencies to physicians or other appropriate health care providers. The bill requires (1) the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to jointly promulgate regulations governing the practice of nurse practitioners without a practice agreement; (2) the Department of Health Professions, by November 1, 2020, to report to the General Assembly a process by which nurse practitioners who practice without a practice agreement may be included in the online Practitioner Profile maintained by the Department of Health Professions; and (3) the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to report information related to the practice of nurse practitioners without a practice agreement that includes certain data, complaints and disciplinary actions, and recommended modifications to the provisions of this bill to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health and the Chairman of the Joint Commission on Health Care by November 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse practitioners; practice agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB793ER)
2018-03-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
2018-02-28HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107422D-S1 (97-Y 2-N)
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseTaken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB793S1
2018-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107422D-S1
2018-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107422D-S1
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB793H1
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106474D-H1
2018-02-09HouseRead second time
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106474D-H1
2018-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104186D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221271.7(n/a)See Bill Text
321263(n/a)See Bill Text
321282(n/a)See Bill Text
5412900(n/a)See Bill Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5412957(n/a)See Bill Text
5412957.01(n/a)See Bill Text
5413016(n/a)See Bill Text
5413018.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413300(n/a)See Bill Text
5413300.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413301(n/a)See Bill Text
5413482(n/a)See Bill Text
5413482.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB793
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB793+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB793H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB793S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB793ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0776+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1201V0031+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H12V0085+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0553+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0285+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0676HB0793+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0689HB0793+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1103+HB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1119+HB0793

Bill Comments

feedback